SC H4462 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Person Who Retires From A Solicitor's Office May Participate In The State Health And Dental Insurance Plans Regardless Of Whether The County In Which He Is Employed At The Time Of His Retirement Participates In These Plans, Among Other Things, And To Make These Provisions Retroactive To January 1, 2012.
Title
Solicitors Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0897 (Similar To) 2014-06-16 - Act No. 248
S0869 (Similar To) 2014-02-24 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Allen, Hembree, Shealy, Young
H4481 (Similar To) 2014-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0869 (Similar To) 2014-02-24 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Allen, Hembree, Shealy, Young
H4481 (Similar To) 2014-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4462&session=120&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/4462_20140114.htm |