SC H4460 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace, Cogswell, Sottile, Stavrinakis, Herbkersman, J.E.Smith, Bernstein, Bradley
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace, Cogswell, Sottile, Stavrinakis, Herbkersman, J.E.Smith, Bernstein, Bradley
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Memorialize The United States Congress And Urge The Members Not To Allow Seismic Surveys Or Acquisitions Off The Coast Of South Carolina, And To Join The Members Of The South Carolina General Assembly In Protecting The Beautiful Beaches And Coastline Of The State From The Inevitable Pollution Of The Air And Sea If Seismic Surveys Or Acquisitions And Further Methods Are Used Resulting In A Negative Impact On The Quality Of Life Along Our Coast And A Detrimental Effect On The Tourism Industry Of The State.
Title
Congress
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace, Cogswell, Sottile, Stavrinakis, Herbkersman, J.E.Smith, Bernstein, Bradley |
2018-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2018-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson-Simpson, McGinnis |
2018-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ridgeway, Brown, Pendarvis, Kirby, Funderburk, M.Rivers, Govan |
2018-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary, G.M.Smith |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4460&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4460_20171213.htm |