SC H4448 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Make This Offense A Felony Rather Than A Misdemeanor And Increase The Penalties For Violation.
Title
Fargo's and Hyco's Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk |
2016-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins, Ballentine |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-12-03 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4448&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4448_20151203.htm |