SC H4443 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify The Type Of Prohibited Expenses.
Title
Definitions; Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0990 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 13 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 1120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 1300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 1308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 1314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 1340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 1348 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4443&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4443_20171213.htm |