SC H4438 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allow The Department To Charge Certain Related Fees, And To Provide For The Use And Administration Of These Fees; And To Amend Section 40-25-150, Relating To Continuing Education Requirements, So As Impose Related Duties On The Department Instead Of The Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHEC, hearing aid specialists licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2018-03-27SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-03-22HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-03-21HouseRoll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
2018-03-21HouseRead second time
2018-03-21HouseAmended
2018-03-20HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-21-18
2018-03-08HouseCommittee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2018-02-01HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced and read first time
2017-12-13HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2017-12-13HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4025110(n/a)See Bill Text
4025150(n/a)See Bill Text
402530(n/a)See Bill Text
402550(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback