SC H4434 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 213
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Define Necessary Terms; To Require The State Department Of Education To Provide Training And Support For A Statewide Multi-tiered Support System Schooling Model Which Must Include A Universal Screening Process To Identify Who May Be At Risk Of Experiencing Academic Difficulties And Social-emotional Development Difficulties; To Provide Local School Districts Shall Use The Universal Screening Process For Certain Students Beginning With The 2019-2020 School Year, Subject To General Assembly Funding; To Provide Screening May Be Requested By Parents, Guardians, And Certain School Personnel; To Provide School Districts Shall Convene School-based Teams To Analyze Data From Screenings To Plan And Implement Appropriate Instruction And Interventions For All Students At Risk Of Experiencing Academic Difficulties; To Require Districts To Provide Parents Of Such At-risk Students With Notice Of Screening Findings And Related Support Information; To Require Districts To Provide At-risk Students With Certain Interventions And To Monitor The Effectiveness Of These Interventions And Student Progress; To Require The Department To Provide Educators With Certain Professional Development Training And Resources Concerning The Statewide Multi-tiered Support System And Related Identification And Intervention Methods; To Require The Department To Develop And Report Findings Concerning The Implementation Of The Statewide Multi-tiered Support System; To Create The Learning Disorders Task Force To Work With The Department In Matters Relating To Reading Disorders; And To Provide For The Composition And Miscellaneous Functions Of The Task Force, Among Other Things

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dyslexia

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Free Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31 Act No. 213
2018-05-25 Effective date 05/18/18
2018-05-18 Signed By Governor
2018-05-14 Ratified R 251
2018-05-09HouseOrdered enrolled for ratification
2018-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2018-05-08SenateFree conference report adopted
2018-05-08SenateFree conference committee appointed Sheheen, Martin, Hembree
2018-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2018-05-08SenateFree conference powers granted
2018-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
2018-05-08HouseFree conference report adopted
2018-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
2018-05-08HouseFree conference committee appointed Felder, Clary, Brown
2018-05-08HouseFree conference powers granted
2018-05-03HouseConference committee appointed Felder, Clary, Brown
2018-05-02SenateSenate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Sheheen, Martin, Hembree
2018-05-01HouseRoll call Yeas-0 Nays-109
2018-05-01HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2018-04-24SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2018-04-18 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-04-17SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2018-04-17SenateRead second time
2018-04-17SenateAmended
2018-04-17SenateCommittee Amendment Amended and Adopted
2018-03-16 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-15SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education
2018-02-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-02-22HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-02-21HouseRoll call Yeas-106 Nays-2
2018-02-21HouseRead second time
2018-02-21HouseRequests for debate-Rep(s). Loftis, Hill, Magnuson
2018-02-21HouseAmended
2018-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan, Cole, King
2018-02-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
2018-02-20 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-02-15HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2018-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Ott
2018-02-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor
2018-02-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope
2018-01-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced and read first time
2017-12-13HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2017-12-13HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3414 (Similar To) 2017-03-22 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stavrinakis, McCoy

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4434&session=122&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4434_20171213.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4434_20180215.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4434_20180220.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4434_20180221.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4434_20180222.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4434_20180315.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4434_20180316.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4434_20180417.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4434_20180418.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4434_20180508.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13964
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=14748
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=14898
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15058
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15070
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15075
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15077

Bill Comments

feedback