SC H4431 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 176
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 176
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 6-1-400 So As To, Among Other Things, Provide Business License Tax Standardization, To Provide Definitions, To Provide For The Manner In Which A Business License Tax Is Computed, To Prescribe The Manner In Which Business Licenses Are Purchased, To Provide That A Taxing Jurisdiction Shall Adopt The Latest Standardized Business License Class Schedule; By Adding Section 6-1-410 So As To, Among Other Things, Define The Procedures By Which The Taxing Jurisdiction May Serve Notice Of Assessment Of The Business License Tax Due When A Taxpayer Fails Or Refuses To Pay A Business License Tax And The Procedures By Which A Taxpayer May Request An Adjustment Of The Assessment Or Appeal The Notice Of Final Assessment; And By Adding Section 6-1-420 So As To, Among Other Things, Provide That A Taxing Jurisdiction, Under Certain Conditions And Limitations, May Contract By Ordinance With An Individual, Firm, Or Organization To Assist With Collecting Property Or Business License Taxes, And To Establish A Private Right Of Action For Persons Or Entities Based On Violations Of This Act Or Any Regulations Prescribed Pursuant To This Act. - Ratified Title
Title
SC Business License Tax Reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Act No. 176 | |
2020-10-07 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2020-09-30 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-09-25 | Ratified R 180 | |
2020-09-24 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-1 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Free conference report received and adopted |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Free conference committee appointed Cromer, Sheheen, Corbin |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Free conference powers granted |
2020-09-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-1 |
2020-09-23 | House | Free conference report adopted |
2020-09-23 | House | Free conference committee appointed Sandifer, Jordan, and Mack |
2020-09-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-1 |
2020-09-23 | House | Free conference powers granted |
2020-09-23 | House | Conference committee appointed Reps. Sandifer, Jordan, Mack |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Cromer, Sheheen, Corbin |
2020-09-23 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Amended |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-09-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-02-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 |
2020-02-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2020-02-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-02-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-26 | House | Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kimmons, Murphy, Chellis |
2020-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning |
2020-02-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-02-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams |
2020-02-20 | House | 24 hour point of order |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby, Sandifer |
2020-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell |
2020-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ligon, Tallon, D.C.Moss |
2020-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Atkinson |
2019-05-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt, Pope |
2019-05-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Long, Magnuson, Clemmons, Davis, Taylor |
2019-05-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rutherford |
2019-04-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton |
2019-04-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox, Elliott, Morgan |
2019-04-23 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Daning |
2019-04-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson, Hyde |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 1 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 1 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 1 | 420 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |