SC H4418 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Require The State Election Commission To Amend The South Carolina Voter Registration Application Form By Adding Appropriately Sized Check Boxes In Which Registrants Voluntarily May Disclose Their Political Party Affiliation; To Require The State Election Commission To Maintain A Record Of The Voluntary, Self-identified Political Party Affiliations Disclosed Pursuant To This Act, And To Provide That This Record Is Subject To Disclosure Pursuant To The Freedom Of Information Act; And To Provide That The Voluntary, Self-identification Of One's Political Party Affiliation Pursuant To This Act May Not Be Used To Restrict Primary Voting.
Title
Voter registration requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater |
2018-04-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson |
2018-03-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Arrington, Putnam, Allison, Sottile, Simrill, West |
2018-03-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gagnon, Herbkersman |
2018-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2018-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McGinnis |
2018-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Murphy |
2018-03-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bryant, Forrest, Hixon, Blackwell, W.Newton, Jordan, Forrester |
2018-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford, Thayer, S.Rivers, Toole, Willis, Taylor, Hewitt, Elliott |
2018-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss, Davis, Huggins, McCravy, Cole, Tallon |
2018-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson, Bennett, Long, Chumley, Burns |
2018-02-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace, Hamilton, Loftis, Magnuson, Felder, Duckworth |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-11-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-11-09 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4418&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4418_20171109.htm |