SC H4413 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Effective date 07/01/19
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide For The Continuing Authority To Pay The Expenses Of State Government If The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year Begins Without A General Appropriations Act For That Year In Effect, And To Provide Exceptions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Resolution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Effective date 07/01/19
2019-05-13 Signed By Governor
2019-05-09 Ratified R 61
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and enrolled
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-04-30SenateCommittee report: Favorable Finance
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-04-17SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-11HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-10HouseRoll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
2019-04-10HouseRead second time
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-04-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Stavrinakis
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-04-04HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback