SC H4412 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Inspect Sources Of Nonionizing Radiation And To Retain Fees To Administer The Program.
Title
Tanning establishments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-04-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0 |
2018-04-03 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-03 | House | Amended |
2018-03-21 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-3-18 |
2018-03-20 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-21-18 |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-11-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-11-09 | House | Prefiled |