SC H4391 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide A Student Who Resides For One Semester In The Community In Which He Attends College Must Be Considered Qualified To Be An Elector And May Register To Vote If He Meets Certain Existing Requirements; And To Make The Provisions Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
Higher Education Trustees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-11-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-11-09 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0678 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 101 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 117 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 117 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 119 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 121 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 121 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 123 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 123 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 125 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 125 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 127 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 130 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 133 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 135 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 136 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 5 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4391&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4391_20171109.htm |