SC H4391 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 305
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 305
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "brain Tissue Donor Study Committee" To Provide A Process And Procedure For Citizens Of This State To Donate Their Brain Tissue Upon Their Death For Research And Education, To Provide For Membership Of The Study Committee, To Require The Study Committee To Prepare A Report For The General Assembly, And To Include A Sunset Provision For The Study Committee
Title
Brain Tissue Donor Study Committee
Sponsors
Rep. James Burns [R] | Rep. Richard Yow [R] | Rep. William Chumley [R] | Rep. Raye Felder [R] |
Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R] | Rep. Neal Collins [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 88 NV: 30 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 31 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 88 NV: 30 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 31 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Act No. 305 | |
2016-06-27 | Effective date 06/22/16 | |
2016-06-22 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-17 | Ratified R 308 | |
2016-06-16 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-1 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Conference report received and adopted |
2016-06-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-0 |
2016-06-15 | House | Conference report adopted |
2016-06-02 | House | Conference committee appointed Burns, Bradley, King |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Alexander, Cleary, Scott |
2016-06-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-88 |
2016-06-01 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-05-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2016-04-20 | House | Read second time |
2016-04-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins |
2016-04-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2016-04-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder, Loftis, Bradley |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-12-03 | House | Prefiled |