SC H4381 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Direct The South Carolina Confederate Relic Room And Military Museum, Through Its Director, To Establish And Maintain An Appropriate, Permanent, And Public Display Of The South Carolina Infantry Battle Flag Of The Confederate States Of America And To Project Associated Costs And Report Those Projections To The Senate Finance Committee And The House Ways And Means Committee By January 1, 2016.
Title
Confederate Relic Room
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Quinn [R] | Rep. Russell Ott [D] | Rep. Kenneth Bingham [R] | Rep. Todd Rutherford [D] |
Rep. Carl Anderson [D] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] | Rep. James Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - House - House: Table Motion To Recall From Judiciary (Y: 27 N: 86 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-07-09 - House - House: Table Motion To Recall From Judiciary (Y: 27 N: 86 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-07-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-07-09 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2015-07-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2015-07-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-07-08 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2015-07-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-07-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4378 (Similar To) 2015-07-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary