SC H4379 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-15)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That On Appeal The Office Does Not Represent The Public Service Commission.
Title
Utilities Consumer Advocate created in the office of the Attorney General
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Table Amendment 7 (Y: 63 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Table Amendment 7 (Y: 63 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Special order, set for May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Massey, McElveen, Sabb, Gambrell, Climer |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-01-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-01-24 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-01-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-1 |
2018-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-23 | House | Amended |
2018-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pendarvis, Govan, Toole |
2018-01-16 | House | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, January 17, 2018 |
2018-01-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning |
2018-01-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett, Arrington |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-11-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-11-09 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 4 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 4 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 4 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 4 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |