SC H4375 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-15)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Act No. 258
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-15)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Act No. 258
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Require Such Production Without The Requirement Of A Confidentiality Agreement Or Protective Order, Except Under Specified Circumstances, To Provide When Such Information Must Be Kept Confidential And When Such Information May Be Disclosed, To Provide Specific Procedures To Protect Confidentiality, And To Allow The Office Of Regulatory Staff To Apply In Circuit Court For Subpoenas To Be Issued To Entities Over Which The Commission Does Not Have Jurisdiction
Title
Utility Plants and projects, rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - House - House: Overide Veto By The Governor (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - House - House: Overide Veto By The Governor (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate: To Carry Over (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Act No. 258 | |
2018-07-05 | Effective date See Act | |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Veto overridden Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2018-06-28 | House | Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-110 Nays-1 |
2018-06-28 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2018-06-28 | Ratified R 287 | |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-2 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Conference report received and adopted |
2018-06-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-4 |
2018-06-27 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2018-05-10 | House | Conference committee appointed McCoy, Finlay, Rutherford |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Setzler, Rankin, Massey |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2018-05-10 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2018-05-10 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Special order, set for May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Massey, McElveen, Sabb, Gambrell, Climer |
2018-02-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-01-31 | House | Roll call Yeas-119 Nays-1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | House | Amended |
2018-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan |
2018-01-30 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 1-31-18 |
2018-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson |
2018-01-25 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 1-30-18 |
2018-01-24 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 1-25-18 |
2018-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks |
2018-01-16 | House | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, January 17, 2018 |
2018-01-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-01-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning |
2018-01-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin, Magnuson, Bennett, Arrington |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-11-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-11-09 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 6 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 6 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 6 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 27 | 850 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 33 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 33 | 280 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 4 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 4 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 4 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |