SC H4366 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, Relating To Requirements For State Water Pollution Control Revolving Fund Loan Assistance, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4838, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
State Water Control Revolving Fund Loan Assistance (D. No. 4838)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-10-19 |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |