SC H4364 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Natural Resources, Relating To Additional Regulations Applicable To Specific Properties, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4860, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Additional Regulation Applicable to Specific Properties (D. No. 4860)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-10-19 |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S0829 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures