SC H4352 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Act No. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 53-3-270 So As To Designate The Month Of March Of Each Year As "middle Level Education Month". - Ratified Title
Title
Middle Level Education Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Act No. 110 | |
2024-02-09 | Effective date 02/05/24 | |
2024-02-05 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-01-30 | Ratified R 111 | |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-04-28 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2023-04-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2023-04-27 | House | Read second time |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2023-04-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-04-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |