SC H4343 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-10)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Read second time SJ-31
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Read second time SJ-31
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING CHAPTER 19 TO TITLE 55 SO AS TO ESTABLISH THE SOUTH CAROLINA AIR SERVICE INCENTIVE AND DEVELOPMENT FUND UNDER THE SOUTH CAROLINA AERONAUTICS COMMISSION TO PROVIDE GRANTS TO REGIONAL ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT ENTITIES OR AIR SERVICE DEVELOPMENT TASK FORCES TO PROVIDE MORE FLIGHT OPTIONS, MORE COMPETITION FOR AIR TRAVEL AND MORE AFFORDABLE AIR FARES FOR THE CITIZENS OF THE REGION AND THIS STATE, AND TO PROVIDE THE SELECTION CRITERIA AND SELECTION PROCESS FOR THESE GRANTS TO BE MADE FROM FUNDS PROVIDED TO OR APPROPRIATED FOR THE FUND BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY.
Title
Establish The South Carolina Air Service Incentive And Development Fund Under The South Carolina Aeronautics Commission To Provide Grants To Regional Economic Development Entities Or Air Service Development Task Forces To Provide More Flight Options, More Competition For Air Travel And More Affordable Air Fares For The Citizens Of The Region And This State, And To Provide The Selection Criteria And Selection Process For These Grants To Be Made From Funds Provided To Or Appropriated For The Fund By The General Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Read second time SJ-31 | |
2010-04-29 | Committee Amendments Carried Over SJ-31 | |
2010-03-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-03-24 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation SJ-11 | |
2010-03-24 | Polled out of committee Transportation SJ-11 | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-18 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced and read first time SJ-18 | |
2010-02-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-02-26 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-5 | |
2010-02-25 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-60 | |
2010-02-25 | Read second time HJ-60 | |
2010-02-25 | Amended HJ-57 | |
2010-02-25 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stavrinakis, Hutto, Viers | |
2010-02-24 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks | |
2010-02-23 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons | |
2010-02-18 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Neilson, Bales | |
2010-02-17 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means HJ-2 | |
2010-02-16 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lucas | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-553 | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced and read first time HJ-552 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4343&session=118 |