SC H4342 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - Tabled HJ-16
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - Tabled HJ-16
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND ACT 959 OF 1954, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE CREATION OF THE YORK COUNTY NATURAL GAS AUTHORITY, SO AS TO INCREASE ITS POWERS TO ALLOW, AMONG OTHER THINGS, THE ACQUISITION OF THE TOWN OF BLACKSBURG'S NATURAL GAS SYSTEM AND TO CHANGE REFERENCES FROM THE SOUTH CAROLINA PIPELINE COMPANY TO THE CAROLINA GAS TRANSMISSION CORPORATION.
Title
Increase Its Powers To Allow, Among Other Things, The Acquisition Of The Town Of Blacksburg's Natural Gas System And To Change References From The South Carolina Pipeline Company To The Carolina Gas Transmission Corporation.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Delleney [R] | Rep. Herbert Kirsh [D] | Rep. Dennis Moss [R] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R] |
Rep. Gary Simrill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Tabled HJ-16 | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-552 |
Same As/Similar To
S0678 (Similar To) 2009-04-15 - Committed to delegation from Cherokee County SJ-32
S1022 (Similar To) 2010-09-09 - Act No. 323
S1022 (Similar To) 2010-09-09 - Act No. 323
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4342&session=118 |