SC H4341 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 1-1-1100 So As To Prohibit The Implementation Of Unconstitutional Federal Orders At The State Or Local Level; And To Amend Section 2-11-50, Relating To The Duties Of The Legislative Council, So As To Authorize The Legislative Council To Review Any Presidential Executive Order, Act, Law, Treaty, Regulation, Rule, Or Regulatory Order Issued, Adopted, Or Implemented On Or After January 1, 2021, And Refer The Matter To The Attorney General For A Constitutional Determination And To Submit Any Findings To The General Assembly For Consideration.
Title
Executive Orders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith |
2021-05-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4341&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/4341_20210505.htm |