SC H4335 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO DECLARE FEBRUARY 2010 AS "NATIONAL CHILDREN'S DENTAL HEALTH MONTH" AND FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 5, 2010, AS "GIVE KIDS A SMILE DAY" IN SOUTH CAROLINA, IN ORDER TO PROMOTE ORAL HEALTH AND JOIN IN THE EFFORTS THROUGHOUT THE NATION TO ADVOCATE FOR ORAL HEALTH AWARENESS AND OPTIMAL ORAL HEALTH IN CHILDREN.
Title
Declare February 2010 As "national Children's Dental Health Month" And Friday, February 5, 2010, As "give Kids A Smile Day" In South Carolina, In Order To Promote Oral Health And Join In The Efforts Throughout The Nation To Advocate For Oral Health Awareness And Optimal Oral Health In Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence | |
2010-02-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-02-04 | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs SJ-4 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs SJ-6 | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced SJ-6 | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate HJ-524 |
Same As/Similar To
S1045 (Similar To) 2010-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs SJ-6
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4335&session=118 |