SC H4278 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name Woodville Road In Florence County "bishop Donald Hyman Road" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Road Containing These Words.
Title
"Bishop Donald Hyman Road"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2024-01-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-05-04 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2023-04-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2023-04-05 | House | Introduced |