SC H4274 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Pursuant To Section 9, Article Iii, Of The Constitution Of This State, 1895, When The Respective Houses Of The General Assembly Adjourn On Thursday, June 4, 2015, Not Later Than 5:00 P.m., Or Anytime Earlier, Each House Shall Stand Adjourned To Meet In Statewide Session At 12:00 Noon On Tuesday, June 16, 2015, And Continue In Statewide Session, If Necessary, Until Not Later Than 5:00 P.m. On Thursday, June 18, 2015, For The Consideration Of Certain Specified Matters, And To Provide That When The Respective Houses Of The General Assembly Adjourn Not Later 12:00 Noon Tuesday, January 12, 2016, The General Assembly Shall Stand Adjourned Sine Die.
Title
Sine Die Adjournment
Sponsors
Rep. James Lucas [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - House: Adopt Sine Die Resolution (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |
2015-05-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2015-05-27 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |