SC H4272 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Effective date 03/12/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Effective date 03/12/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Extend The One Percent Sales Tax Imposed By Act 378 Of 2004, As Amended, The Lexington County School District Property Tax Relief Act, For An Additional Seven Years
Title
Lexington County School District Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Effective date 03/12/18 | |
2018-03-12 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-03-07 | Ratified R 146 | |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-81 Nays-1 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2018-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |