SC H4262 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 179
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 5 To Chapter 11, Title 58 So As To, Among Other Things, Enact The "south Carolina Small Wireless Facilities Deployment Act"; To Make Legislative Findings; To Define Relevant Terms; To Make Provisions For Certain Agreements Or Enactments Addressing The Deployment Of Small Wireless Facilities Entered Into Prior To The Effective Date Of This Act; To Provide, Among Other Things, Guidelines And Procedures To Units Of Local Government Regarding Enactments Addressing Decorative Poles, Underground Districts, Design Districts, And Historic Districts; To Affirm The Powers Of Units Of Local Government With Respect To Wireless Facilities That Are Not Small Wireless Facilities Located Within Rights Of Way; To Provide, Among Other Things, Guidelines And Procedures To Wireless Providers And Units Of Local Government With Control Over Rights Of Way Regarding The Collocation Of Certain Small Wireless Facilities Within Rights Of Way; To Make Provisions For Applications, Fees, Application Review, And The Issuance Of Permits For The Collocation Of Small Wireless Facilities; To Require That Applications To Collocate Small Wireless Facilities Pursuant To This Article Must Be Processed On A Nondiscriminatory Basis; To Enumerate The Conditions Under Which A Unit Of Local Government May Deny An Applicant's Proposed Collocation Of A Small Wireless Facility, And To Provide That Subject To The Ability Of A Unit Of Local Government To Deny An Application, The Collocation Of Small Wireless Facilities Must Be Allowed On Nondiscriminatory Terms And Conditions; To Provide That The Administrative Law Court Has Contested Case Jurisdiction To Determine All Disputes Arising Under This Act; And To Prohibit A Unit Of Local Government From Requiring A Wireless Provider To Indemnify And Hold The Authority And Its Officers And Employees Harmless Against Any Claims, Lawsuits, Judgments, Costs, Liens, Losses, Expenses, Or Fees, Except When A Court Of Competent Jurisdiction Has Found That The Negligence Of The Wireless Provider While Installing, Repairing, Or Maintaining Facilities, Poles, Or Support Structures Pursuant To This Act Caused The Harm That Created Such Claims, Lawsuits, Judgments, Costs, Liens, Losses, Expenses, Or Fees. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Wireless Facilities Deployment Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-07 Act No. 179
2020-10-07 Effective date 09/29/20
2020-09-29 Signed By Governor
2020-09-25 Ratified R 190
2020-09-24HouseRoll call Yeas-104 Nays-1
2020-09-24HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2020-09-24SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2020-09-23SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-09-23SenateRoll call Ayes-32 Nays-6
2020-09-23SenateRead second time
2020-09-23SenateAmended
2020-09-23SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-28SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Gambrell (ch), Hutto, Goldfinch, Sabb, Climer
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Gambrell (ch), Hutto, Massey, Sabb, Climer
2019-04-04 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-04SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-04HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-03HouseRoll call Yeas-108 Nays-2
2019-04-03HouseRead second time
2019-04-03HouseAmended
2019-04-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
2019-03-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith, S.Williams
2019-03-27 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-27HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-03-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson
2019-03-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams
2019-03-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: West
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0638 (Similar To) 2019-03-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback