SC H4248 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Act No. 168
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Act No. 168
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 59-19-117 SO AS TO REQUIRE AN INDIVIDUAL HIRED TO SERVE IN ANY CAPACITY IN A PUBLIC SCHOOL DISTRICT TO UNDERGO A CRIMINAL RECORD SEARCH BY THE SOUTH CAROLINA LAW ENFORCEMENT DIVISION, TO REQUIRE THE DISTRICT BOARD TO ADOPT A WRITTEN POLICY ON THE CRIMINAL RECORD SEARCHES, AND TO PROVIDE FOR TRAINING FOR APPROPRIATE DISTRICT PERSONNEL ON THE CRIMINAL RECORD SEARCHES; TO REQUIRE EACH SCHOOL DISTRICT TO PERFORM A NATIONAL SEX OFFENDER REGISTRY CHECK ON ALL DISTRICT EMPLOYEES AND ON CERTAIN VOLUNTEERS, TO PROVIDE FOR TRAINING FOR APPROPRIATE DISTRICT PERSONNEL ON APPROPRIATE USES OF THE DATABASE, AND TO REQUIRE EACH DISTRICT BOARD TO ADOPT A WRITTEN POLICY ON THE SEX OFFENDER REGISTRY CHECK; AND TO AMEND SECTION 23-3-115, RELATING TO FEES FOR CRIMINAL RECORD SEARCHES, SO AS TO PROVIDE FOR WAIVER OF THE FEE IMPOSED FOR A CRIMINAL RECORD SEARCH WHEN IT IS CONDUCTED ON A SUBSTITUTE TEACHER ON BEHALF OF A SCHOOL DISTRICT. - ratified title
Title
Provide For Waiver Of The Fee Imposed For A Criminal Record Search When It Is Conducted On A Substitute Teacher On Behalf Of A School District. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Act No. 168 | |
2010-05-21 | Effective date 05/11/10 | |
2010-05-11 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Ratified R 198 | |
2010-04-20 | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-1 HJ-90 | |
2010-04-20 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-90 | |
2010-03-31 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments SJ-14 | |
2010-03-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-03-30 | Read second time SJ-17 | |
2010-03-30 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted SJ-17 | |
2010-03-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-03-25 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education SJ-14 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Committee on Education SJ-6 | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced and read first time SJ-6 | |
2010-03-04 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-16 | |
2010-03-03 | Read second time HJ-91 | |
2010-03-03 | Amended HJ-90 | |
2010-03-03 | Debate interrupted HJ-19 | |
2010-03-03 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis | |
2010-03-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons | |
2010-02-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-02-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-02-25 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works HJ-5 | |
2010-01-14 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-46 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced and read first time HJ-45 | |
2009-12-15 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2009-12-15 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4248&session=118 |