SC H4246 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Erect Appropriate Signs Along United States Highway 17 Alternate At Separate Locations East And West Of Its Intersection With United States Highway 176 In Berkeley County Containing The Words "northwood Academy Lady Chargers Scisa 3a 2017 State Basketball Champions".
Title
Northwood Academy Lady Chargers SCISA 3A 2017 State Basketball Champions
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Daning [R] | Rep. William Crosby [R] | Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. Sylleste Davis [R] |
Rep. Samuel Rivers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-05-09 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced |