SC H4244 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Act No. 115
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Act No. 115
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 38-78-20, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Definitions Applicable To Service Contracts, So As To Expand The Definition Of "service Contract" And "warranty" And To Define The Terms "road Hazard", "theft Protection Program", And "theft Protection Program Warranty"; To Amend Section 38-78-30, Relating To Service Contract Requirements, So As To Exclude A Service Contract Provider That Insures Their Obligations Under A Reimbursement Insurance Policy From The Financial Statement Requirement For Registration With The Director Of The Department Of Insurance; And To Amend Section 38-78-50, Relating To Required Provisions In Service Contracts, So As To Require A Certain Disclosure. - Ratified Title
Title
Service contract requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 2a Amendment Number 2a (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 2a Amendment Number 2a (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Act No. 115 | |
2020-02-05 | Effective date See Act | |
2020-02-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-01-29 | Ratified R 117 | |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2020-01-15 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2020-01-15 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2019-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2019-04-02 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-02 | House | Amended |
2019-03-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 78 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 78 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 78 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |