SC H4233 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Located At The Junction Of South Carolina Highway 14 And Fews Chapel Road In Greenville County "william 'bud' Turner Memorial Intersection" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Intersection Containing These Words.
Title
William "Bud" Turner Memorial Intersection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-04-03 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2019-04-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced |