SC H4177 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 7-7-490, Relating To Designation Of Voting Precincts In Spartanburg County, So As To Delete Certain Precincts, Add New Precincts, And To Redesignate The Map Number On Which These Precincts May Be Found On File With The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office. - Ratified Title
Title
Spartanburg County Voting Precincts
Sponsors
Rep. Max Hyde [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Act No. 48 | |
2023-05-26 | Effective date 07/01/23 | |
2023-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2023-05-11 | Ratified R 58 | |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-05-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2023-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-02 | House | Amended |
2023-04-26 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Spartanburg Delegation |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to Spartanburg Delegation |
2023-03-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |