SC H4175 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of South Carolina Highway 5 In York County From Northwestern High School To Its Intersection With United States Highway 321 "veterans Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing This Designation.
Title
Veterans Memorial Highway in York County
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. Dennis Moss [R] | Rep. Gary Simrill [R] | Rep. Raye Felder [R] |
Rep. Brandon Newton [R] | Rep. Gregory Delleney [R] | Rep. Steve Moss [R] | Rep. John King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-05-04 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-04-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-04-25 | House | Introduced |