SC H4164 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fix Noon On Wednesday, May 27, 2015, As The Time To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Supreme Court, Chief Justice, Upon Her Retirement On Or Before December 31, 2015, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire July 31, 2024; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Fourth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2016, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office; And As The Date To Meet In Joint Session For The Purpose Of Electing A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of Coastal Carolina University, First Congressional District, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2019; To Elect A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of Coastal Carolina University, Third Congressional District, Seat 3, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2019; To Elect A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of Coastal Carolina University, Fifth Congressional District, Seat 5, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2019; To Elect A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of Coastal Carolina University, Seventh Congressional District, Seat 7, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2019; To Elect A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of Coastal Carolina University, At-large, Seat 9, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2019; To Elect A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of Coastal Carolina University, At-large, Seat 11, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2019; To Elect A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of Coastal Carolina University, At-large, Seat 13, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2019; And For The Purpose Of Electing A Member To The Board Of Trustees Of Lander University, Sixth Congressional District, Seat 6, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2016; And For The Purpose Of Electing A Member To The Board Of Trustees Of Winthrop University, At-large, Seat 10, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2021; And For The Purpose Of Electing A Member To The Board Of Trustees For The Old Exchange Building Commission, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2021; And For The Purpose Of Electing Three Members To The Board Of Trustees For The Wil Lou Gray Opportunity School, At-large, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2019; And For The Purpose Of Electing Three Members To Fill Vacancies Or Expired Terms On The Legislative Audit Council Pursuant To Section 2-15-10 From Among The Candidates Nominated By The Legislative Audit Council Nominating Committee Pursuant To Section 2-15-20.
Title
University Board of Trustees and Judge elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-05-12 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |
Same As/Similar To
S0460 (Similar To) 2016-06-01 - Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
S0760 (Similar To) 2015-05-12 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
S0760 (Similar To) 2015-05-12 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4164&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4164_20150512.htm |