SC H4161 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 190
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 190
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-21-2710, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Types Of Gaming Machines Prohibited By Law, So As To Provide That The Prohibition Does Not Apply To Certain Items That Are Designated For Use In Out-of-state Jurisdictions By A Gaming Device Manufacturer; And To Amend Section 16-19-50, Relating To The Keeping Of Unlawful Gaming Tables, So As To Provide That The Prohibition Does Not Apply To Certain Items That Are Designated For Use In Out-of-state Jurisdictions By A Gaming Device Manufacturer. - Ratified Title
Title
Gaming machines and tables, prohited
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 190 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/22 | |
2022-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 211 | |
2022-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-78 Nays-21 |
2022-05-11 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-33 Nays-6 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-03-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-85 Nays-25 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-09 | House | Amended |
2022-03-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Thurs., 3-3-22 |
2022-02-17 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |