SC H4160 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of South Carolina Highway 417 In Greenville County From Its Intersection With South Carolina Highway 14 To Its Intersection With Brookwood Point Place "reverend Carlos Blease Watson Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing This Designation.
Title
Reverend Carlos Blease Watson Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Long [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-04-26 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-04-20 | House | Introduced |