SC H4153 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 56-2)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, So As To Enact The "save Women's Sports Act" By Adding Section 59-1-500 So As To Ensure Continued Inclusivity Of Females In The School Sports Arena By Providing That Public And Private Middle School-level And High School-level Teams And Sports Must Be Designated Based On Biological Sex, To Provide That Teams Or Sports Designated For Females May Be Restricted To Students Of The Female Sex, To Provide For Certain Protections For Public And Private Schools, And To Provide Certain Relief For Violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Save Women's Sports Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
2021-04-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith
2021-04-06HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-04-06HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0531 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Recommitted to Committee on Education
H3477 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill
H4608 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed By Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591500(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback