SC H4146 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, White, West
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, White, West
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 12-6-3810 So As To Enact The "livable Homes Tax Credit Act", To Provide For An Individual Income Tax Credit To An Individual Who Purchases A New Residence Or Retrofits An Existing Residence, Provided That The New Residence Or The Retrofitting Of The Existing Residence Is Designed To Improve Accessibility, To Provide A Cumulative Total For Which The Credit May Not Exceed, To Provide Certain Design Element Requirements And Eligible Costs, And To Provide A Maximum Amount Of Tax Credits That May Be Granted In Each Income Tax Year.
Title
Livable Homes Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, White, West |
2022-02-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wetmore, Stavrinakis, Matthews |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0583 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4146&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/4146_20210406.htm |