SC H4134 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Transportation, Relating To Commission Approval Of Actions, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4685, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Department of Transportation Commission approval of actions (D. No. 4685)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-04-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-04-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |