SC H4133 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-3530, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Community Development Tax Credits, So As To Allow A Tax Credit Of Fifty Percent Of Any Cash Donation To A Community Development Corporation Or Community Development Financial Institutions, To Increase An Aggregate Credit Provision, To Establish Tax Credit Reserve Accounts For The First Three Quarters Of Each Tax Year So As To Avoid The Depletion Of Credits By An Individual Taxpayer, To Delete The Pro-rata Distribution Of Tax Credits, To Allow Financial Institutions With Tax Liabilities In This State To Invest In Community Development Corporations For The Purpose Of Receiving A Tax Credit, And To Provide That Returns On Investments In Certified Community Development Corporations And Certified Community Development Financial Institutions May Not Exceed The Total Amount Of The Initial Investment; To Amend Section 4 Of Act 314 Of 2000, As Amended, Relating To Community Development Corporations And Financial Institutions, So As To Extend The Provisions Of The South Carolina Community Economic Development Act Until June 30, 2023; And By Adding Section 12-6-3775 So As To Provide For An Income Tax Credit To An Individual Or Business That Constructs, Purchases, Or Leases Certain Solar Energy Property And That Places It In Service In Certain Places In This State, And To Define Necessary Terms. - Ratified Title
Title
Community Development Corporations and Financial Institutions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 1a (Y: 98 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Act No. 77 | |
2019-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/19 | |
2019-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Ratified R 97 | |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2019-05-09 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-05-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-7 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Finance |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-04-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-6 |
2019-04-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0424 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0879 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Finance
S0879 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Finance