SC H4122 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-7)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Act No. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-7)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Act No. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 59-63-95, Relating To The Authorized Use Of Epinephrine Auto-injectors In Schools, So As To Expand The Provisions Of This Section To Include The Provision Of Lifesaving Medications, And To Provide Certain Related Responsibilities Of The Department Of Health And Environmental Control And The Department Of Education. - Ratified Title
Title
Administration of lifesaving medication in schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Act No. 47 | |
2023-05-26 | Effective date 05/16/23 | |
2023-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2023-05-11 | Ratified R 57 | |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-05-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Education |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Polled out of committee Education |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-04-06 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2023-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2023-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell |
2023-04-05 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Chapman |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-03-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |