SC H4117 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 212
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 212
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Add An Exception For The Provision Of Data To Drug Courts
Title
Prescription Monitoring Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 88 NV: 29 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 88 NV: 29 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 212 | |
2018-05-25 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 250 | |
2018-05-09 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2018-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Conference report adopted |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Conference report adopted |
2018-05-08 | House | Conference committee appointed Fry, Henderson, Ridgeway |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Hutto, Davis, Corbin |
2018-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-88 |
2018-05-03 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2018-03-20 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-20 | House | Amended |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |