SC H4116 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Medical Practice Act May Not Be Construed To Require Physicians To Secure Maintenance Of Certifications As A Condition Of Licensure, Reimbursement, Employment, Or Admitting Privileges At Hospitals Or Federally Qualified Health Centers In This State; And To Define Necessary Terms
Title
Medical Practice Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Ridgeway [D] | Rep. MaryGail Douglas [D] | Rep. Kit Spires [R] | Rep. Murrell Smith [R] |
Rep. Alan Clemmons [R] | Rep. Edward Tallon [R] | Rep. Derham Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 211 | |
2018-05-25 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 249 | |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2018-04-25 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2018-04-25 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2018-04-25 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2018-04-19 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-24-18 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Amended |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-23 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-02-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Tallon, Cole |
2018-02-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-05-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |