SC H4111 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Proposed Anyor Overpass That Will Cross United States Highway 501 In The Town Of Aynor The "julius H. 'duke' Goodson Overpass" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Overpass That Contain The Words "julius H. 'duke' Goodson Overpass".
Title
Julius H. 'Duke' Goodson Overpass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence | |
2011-05-25 | Committee report: Favorable Transportation | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-05-05 | Introduced | |
2011-05-04 | Adopted, sent to Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-04-26 | Introduced |