SC H4108 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Act No. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Act No. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Change The Definition Of "special Needs Account Customer" To Include Customers Who Suffer From Alzheimer's Disease Or Dementia
Title
Municipalities
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Act No. 122 | |
2012-02-29 | Effective date 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-02-21 | Ratified R 130 | |
2012-02-07 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2012-02-02 | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 | |
2012-02-02 | Read second time | |
2012-02-01 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Campbell | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-03 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-04-29 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-04-28 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2011-04-28 | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 | |
2011-04-28 | Read second time | |
2011-04-27 | Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-04-14 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3199 (Similar To) 2011-01-11 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
S0863 (Similar To) 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Campbell
S0863 (Similar To) 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Campbell
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 49 | 1410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5 | 31 | 2510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 27 | 2510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 31 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 5 | 1110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 11 | 2510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |