SC H4099 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Interchange Located At The Intersection Of Interstate Highway 526 And United States Highway 17 North In Charleston County "representative H. B. 'chip' Limehouse Iii Interchange" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Interchange That Contain The Words "representative H. B. 'chip' Limehouse Iii Interchange".
Title
Representative H. B. "Chip" Limehouse III Interchange
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence | |
2011-06-01 | Recalled from Committee on Transportation | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-05-05 | Introduced | |
2011-05-04 | Adopted, sent to Senate | |
2011-05-04 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson | |
2011-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-04-28 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-04-13 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-04-13 | Introduced |