SC H4098 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 115
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 115
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Clemson University-state Crop Pest Commission, Relating To Asian Longhorned Beetle Quarantine, Designated As Regulation Document Number 5015, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code. - Ratified Title
Title
Clemson University-State Crop Pest Commission - JR to Approve Regulation Document No. 5015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Act No. 115 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/17/21 | |
2021-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-13 | Ratified R 100 | |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2021-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |