SC H4090 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Act No. 262
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Act No. 262
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer The Authority To Order Certain Equitable Relief From The Administrative Law Court To The Department; And To Provide Counties And Municipalities May Enact Ordinances That Comply With, But That Are Not More Restrictive Than, The Provisions Of This Act, And To Provide Exceptions, Among Other Things
Title
Pawnbrokers
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Bedingfield [R] | Rep. William Sandifer [R] | Rep. Grady Brown [D] | Rep. Nathan Ballentine [R] |
Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Act No. 262 | |
2016-06-15 | Effective date 06/09/16 | |
2016-06-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-06 | Ratified R 300 | |
2016-06-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 |
2016-06-02 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Amended |
2016-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Amended |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-04-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-02-11 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2016-02-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Amended |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-04-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 29 | 145 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 29 | 155 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 29 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 29 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 39 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 39 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 39 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 39 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 39 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 39 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 39 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 39 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 39 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 39 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 39 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |