SC H4089 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Campsen, Coleman, Davis, Nicholson
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Campsen, Coleman, Davis, Nicholson
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize Hospital Public Service Districts To Enter Into Agreements With Nonprofit Entities And To Transfer Assets And Liabilities To Such Nonprofit Entities And Provide Conditions And Requirements For These Agreements And Transfers.
Title
Hospital public service districts
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Alexander [D] | Rep. Liston Barfield [R] | Rep. Tracy Edge [R] | Rep. George Hearn [R] |
Rep. Thad Viers [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Campsen, Coleman, Davis, Nicholson | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-03 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-04-28 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 | |
2011-04-27 | Read second time | |
2011-04-27 | Amended | |
2011-04-27 | Requests for debate removed-Rep | |
2011-04-27 | Requests for debate-Rep | |
2011-04-26 | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, April 27, 2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Delegation report: Favorable Horry Delegation | |
2011-04-14 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Viers | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Horry Delegation | |
2011-04-14 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-13 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0809 (Similar To) 2011-04-15 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Campsen, Coleman, Davis, Nicholson