SC H4088 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriate Funding For Certain Infrastructure And Purposes To Foster Economic Development And Prescribe The Appropriate Purposes, Terms, And Conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-13 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: Table Motion To Reconsider The Vote (Y: 93 N: 14 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2023-03-14SenateIntroduced and read first time
2023-03-13HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-14
2023-03-13HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2023-03-09 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-03-09HouseRoll call Yeas-96 Nays-12
2023-03-09HouseRead second time
2023-03-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley, Hager, Connell, Herbkersman, Pedalino, Anderson, King
2023-03-09HouseSpecial order, set for third reading immediately following roll call on Mon., Mar. 13.
2023-03-09HouseSpecial order, set for Thur. Mar. 9, immediatley following the third reading bills.
2023-03-08HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2023-03-08HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Murphy, Robbins, Gatch, Hart, Thigpen
2023-03-07HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2023-03-07HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback