SC H4087 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 310
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 310
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND ACT 743 OF 1962, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE GREENVILLE COUNTY COMMISSION FOR TECHNICAL EDUCATION, SO AS TO CREATE THE GREENVILLE TECHNICAL COLLEGE AREA COMMISSION AND TO PROVIDE FOR ITS MEMBERSHIP, POWERS, AND DUTIES; AND TO DELETE SECTIONS 2 AND 3 OF ACT 743 OF 1962. - ratified title
Title
Create The Greenville Technical College Area Commission And To Provide For Its Membership, Powers, And Duties; And To Delete Sections 2 And 3 Of Act 743 Of 1962. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 310 | |
2010-04-12 | Effective date 03/31/10 | |
2010-03-31 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-03-25 | Ratified R 161 | |
2010-02-23 | Ordered enrolled for ratification SJ-15 | |
2010-02-18 | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 HJ-39 | |
2010-02-18 | Free conference report received and adopted HJ-36 | |
2010-02-18 | Free conference committee appointed Reps. Loftis, Bedingfield, and Allen | |
2010-02-18 | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-1 | |
2010-02-18 | Free conference powers granted HJ-34 | |
2010-02-17 | Free conference report adopted SJ-58 | |
2010-02-17 | Free conference committee appointed Fair, Anderson, and Shoopman SJ-58 | |
2010-02-17 | Free conference powers granted SJ-58 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Fair, Anderson, and Shoopman SJ-11 | |
2010-02-02 | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Loftis, Bedingfield, and Allen HJ-46 | |
2010-01-28 | Non-concurrence in House amendment SJ-57 | |
2010-01-26 | Returned to Senate with amendments HJ-13 | |
2010-01-26 | Senate amendment amended HJ-10 | |
2010-01-19 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments SJ-11 | |
2010-01-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-01-14 | Read second time SJ-15 | |
2010-01-14 | Amended SJ-15 | |
2010-01-13 | Recalled from Committee on Education SJ-7 | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Education SJ-7 | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced and read first time SJ-7 | |
2010-01-13 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-27 | |
2009-05-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-05-21 | Read second time HJ-52 | |
2009-05-21 | Amended HJ-52 | |
2009-05-21 | Reconsidered HJ-52 | |
2009-05-21 | Debate adjourned until Friday, May 22, 2009 HJ-16 | |
2009-05-20 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-8 |
Same As/Similar To
S0862 (Similar To) 2009-05-21 - Read second time SJ-41
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4087&session=118 |